PONSANOOTH HALL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and manage the running of Ponsanooth Village Hall on behalf of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 23 June 2011: Standard registration
- PHMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Paul Williams | Chair | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anita Jervis | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Beckett | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Law | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Dixon | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Williams | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Grace Jenkin | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew John Ridout | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maria Manetta | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Ridout | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER TREWERN | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY JENKINS | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.25k | £5.60k | £15.24k | £19.72k | £20.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.57k | £11.75k | £16.52k | £21.50k | £22.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROVIDE THE RESIDENTS OF PONSANOOTH AND THE PARISH OF ST GLUVIAS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH A CENTRE AND FOCUS WHERE ALL CAN MEET AND WHERE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF COMMUNITY WELFARE AND FOR RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION ARE AVAILABLE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF ENHANCING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS. (2) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES HAVE POWER: TO BUILD OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ponsanooth Village Hall
St. Michaels Road
Ponsanooth
TRURO
Cornwall
TR3 7EE
- Phone:
- 01872863140
- Email:
- chris.trewern@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window