Trustees ST. ANDREW'S CENTRE
Charity number: 1141957

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE HEATH | Chair | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Derek Charlton | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Platt | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Douglas | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Jackman-Jones | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MANDY HOSKING | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALVAN WRIGHT | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SONIA WESTON | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE DAWN HEPBURN | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.