Financial history BREYER FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1142781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £14.09k £215.89k £14.50k £14.50k £71.74k
Total expenditure £14.35k £227.92k £11.30k £11.30k £22.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £215.89k N/A N/A N/A