Ahlulbait Cultural Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a social meeting place where persons can engage in the teaching of the Ahlulbayt twelve Imams. The centre offers an opportunity for the Muslim Community to take part in a communal meal and later participate in the doctrines and practices of Imam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Standard registration
- AHLUL AL BAIT CULTURAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOUSA abid MOUSA | Chair | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ARKAN ALATAR | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Majid MOSSA | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
TARQ ALZAIDWI | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.76k | £39.32k | £77.01k | £86.51k | £59.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.02k | £25.48k | £58.99k | £112.75k | £65.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2024 | 485 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 568 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2012 as amended on 01 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF THE AHULULBAYT TWELVE IMAMS AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION. 2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACULTIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3)SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ahlul Albait Cultural Centre
Community House
1 Stainsby Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS5 4JS
- Phone:
- 01429869148
- Email:
- ahlulbaitcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window