THE WAYNE MCGREGOR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants derived from the income from it's settled funds to individuals or organisations for the advancement primarily, but not exclusively, of all forms of dance and choreography.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Kenya
Governance
- 18 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir Wayne MCGREGOR | Chair | 13 April 2011 |
|
|||||
LADY ANGELA MARY BERNSTEIN | Trustee | 03 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK TREHARNE | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET JANE CRUICKSHANK | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £344 | £1.79k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £900 | £75.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 February 2025 | 1466 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS, CULTURE AND SCIENCE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ALL FORMS OF ART, CHOREOGRAPHY, DANCE, DESIGN, ARCHITECTURE, THE PERFORMING ARTS AND COGNITIVE SCIENCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Accounts Action (S E) Ltd
Ground Floor
Southon House
Station Approach
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 5LP
- Phone:
- 01883732203
- Website:
-
WWW.WAYNEMCGREGORFOUNDATION.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window