Financial history SDSA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.40k £26.36k £6.72k £84.42k £16.52k
Total expenditure £35.50k £172.78k £11.49k £21.61k £21.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.64k £3.60k N/A N/A N/A