Financial history MAITLAND EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1142940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £65.27k £56.03k £160.71k £54.13k £56.04k
Total expenditure £45.43k £45.80k £49.49k £67.93k £70.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A