LEEDS ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE LIC IS RUNNING THE MOSQUE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE, WHICH PROVIDES FOR SOCIAL, CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. THE CHARITY ALSO HAS FUNERAL SERVICES AND THE COST FOR THESE SERVICES IS MADE DIRECTLY BY THE DONOR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHAH NOOR KHAN | Chair | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Farooq | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Farzand Ali | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NISAR AHMED | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MUMTAZ HUSSAIN | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
BARKAT ALI | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
SAIFUL ISLAM MALIK | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
HABIB AHMED | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL RAOUF | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MALIK | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED YOUNIS | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIYAS AHMED | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.09k | £212.84k | £383.04k | £353.89k | £456.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.17k | £163.22k | £250.54k | £286.18k | £293.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROPAGATION OF ISLAM
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 SPENCER PLACE
LEEDS
LS7 4BR
- Phone:
- 01132629896
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window