BRITISH MYOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Society is to act as a multidisciplinary professional body of experts to promote the clinical practice, education and advancement of knowledge about muscle disease, myasthenia gravis and spinal muscular atrophy in the British Isles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 2011: Standard registration
- MBS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rosaline Quinlivan | Chair | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL HANNA | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR FRANCESCO MUNTONI FRCPCH | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.59k | £40.22k | £48.11k | £54.39k | £78.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.10k | £43.17k | £34.88k | £67.00k | £72.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CLINICAL PRACTICE, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT MUSCLE DISEASE, MYASTHENIA GRAVIS AND SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY IN THE BRITISH ISLES.
Area of benefit
THE BRITISH ISLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOX 102
NATIONAL HOSPITAL FOR NEUROLOGY &
NEUROSURGERY
QUEEN SQUARE
LONDON
UK
- Phone:
- 02034488013
- Email:
- cnmd.contact@ucl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window