KORI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing and enhancing potential, skills and talent of youth using the arts, sports, academic support, cultural, environmental education and mentoring for the benefit of families and communities. The programme is focused on advancing skills and experience to standards that bring true enrichment to lives, it has an ethos of practical development, support, advocacy and provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Althea Clarke | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Asante | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Ohene Asante Regan | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Natalie Victoria Mitchell | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Demitrius Alexander Nurse | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pharell Thelwell | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Rose-Scott | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.11k | £63.00k | £42.93k | £87.00k | £142.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.53k | £37.00k | £57.37k | £64.00k | £113.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £960 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 8- 25 YEARS LIVING IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND AND ESPECIALLY IN LONDON. PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND ADVICE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF : A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT , MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B ADVANCING EDUCATION C)RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT D)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Maya Place
London
N11 2EZ
- Phone:
- 02038747074
- Email:
- info@kori.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window