WORLD APPEAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty internationally by providing: grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. To assist in such ways as the charity trustees think fit whose aims include advancing education of persons by developing their mental, physical and moral capabilities through leisure time activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Throughout London
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Malawi
- Pakistan
- Senegal
- Somalia
- The Gambia
Governance
- 23 June 2011: Standard registration
- 23 December 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 December 2021: Funds transferred to 1194117 WORLD APPEAL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2017 | 01/05/2018 | 01/05/2019 | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.58k | £84.96k | £41.05k | £16.92k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.94k | £85.10k | £53.35k | £4.67k | £7.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2019 | 21 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2019 | 21 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 May 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2011 as amended on 20 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN POOR COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA AND PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION INCLUDING THE BUILDING AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOLS. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN POOR COUNTRIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO CLEAN WATER SUPPLIES. 3) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF DRUG ABUSE AND OF WOMEN IN THE UK WHO ARE FORCED INTO MARRIAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 4) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window