COMMUNITY EDUCATION ACADEMY OF LEADERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leadership opportunities School support Partnerships Mentoring IAG?s Bid writing Family learning Enterprise Start up support Business workshops Young enterprise training Home school links Preparation for work based experience Parents? employability skills training Healthy life styles Seminars
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £76,420 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 November 2011: Standard registration
- CEAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHRISTOPHER ADRIAN JOHNSON | Chair | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Devinder Riat | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHIVARJUN SINGH BHOGAL | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Jones Ms | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.04k | £43.56k | £93.18k | £15.21k | £76.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.70k | £29.38k | £92.38k | £22.74k | £59.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £76.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.04k | N/A | £64.90k | £4.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 August 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING INNOVATIVE SERVICES TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN WEST MIDLANDS AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greets Green Community Enterprise
157
Wood Lane
WEST BROMWICH
West Midlands
- Phone:
- 01215582249
- Email:
- ceal01@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window