Financial history BRIGHTON & HOVE AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity Number: 1142273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.35k £81.86k £139.74k £163.73k £215.48k
Total expenditure £50.91k £71.77k £153.41k £150.93k £224.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.80k N/A N/A N/A