FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Raising funds to support and advance the work of our partner charity in Thailand (CCD, Registered Thai Foundation). 2. Recruiting, screening and training skilled volunteers and professional interns on behalf of CCD. 3. Raising public awareness of the needs of children with disabilities in Thailand.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Thailand
Governance
- 23 September 2011: Standard registration
- FOR LIFE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Hannah Drury | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Whitehorn | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Daly | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Whitelaw | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bryan | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Justine Clair Clifford | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA GEORGE | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.41k | £133.50k | £93.68k | £96.22k | £96.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.72k | £130.03k | £97.12k | £98.15k | £80.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF DISABLED AND ABANDONED CHILDREN AND THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES IN ASIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN AREAS RELATING TO DISABLED AND ABANDONED CHILDREN IN ASIA; AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN SCHEDULE 2 TO THESE ARTICLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
For Life Thailand
Stanley Halls
12 South Norwood Hill
London
SE25 6AB
- Phone:
- 02031765254
- Email:
- info@forlifethailand.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window