WIDECOMBE HISTORY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold regular monthly meetings throughout the year, with a guest speaker and also arrange outings for members. We have a series of local history projects on the go at any one time, currently these include: North Hall and Digitising and Cataloguing the History Group and Parish Archive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 16 November 2011: Standard registration
- WHG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE HUGH FRENCH | Chair | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN SOUTHCOMBE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Susan Barrow | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rose Mortimore | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.59k | £4.04k | £1.66k | £3.48k | £4.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.72k | £2.14k | £6.32k | £2.82k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS HISTORICAL OR ALLIED NATURE, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE ARISING IN WIDECOMBE PARISH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN DOING SO TO PRESERVE AND ARCHIVE MATERIAL OF HISTORICAL INTEREST, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) CREATING AND MAINTAINING A HERITAGE CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PRESENTING ITEMS FOR LOCAL EXHIBITION B) PROMOTING, RESEARCHING AND RECORDING LOCAL HISTORY; C) ACTING AS CUSTODIANS OF HISTORICAL MATERIAL PERTAINING TO WIDECOMBE PARISH LOCAL HISTORY BY COLLECTING TOGETHER, CONSERVING AND ARCHIVING ALL SUCH MATERIAL AND ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE HISTORICAL MATERIAL, FROM WHEREVER IT MAY ORIGINATE; D) PROVIDING ACCESS TO ARCHIVES TO THE PUBLIC FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES THROUGH VARIOUS MEANS, INCLUDING, INTER ALIA, A HERITAGE CENTRE; E) UNDERTAKING OR PROVIDING HISTORICAL RESEARCH PROJECTS, EXHIBITIONS, BOOKS, THE INTERNET, ARTEFACT RESTORATION, WALKS, OUTINGS, AND A REGULAR PROGRAMME OF SPEAKERS AND DISCUSSION EVENINGS; F) RECORDING THE LIVING HISTORY OF THE WHG THROUGH PHOTOGRAPHS, WRITING, AUDIO AND OTHER MEDIA; G) UNDERTAKING SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE DEEMED NECESSARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dunstone Methodist Church
Lady Meadow Terrace
Widecombe in the Moor
Newton Abbot
Devon
TQ13 7TH
- Phone:
- 01364621520
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window