STUDENT MINDS

Charity Number: 1142783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

No student should be held back by their mental health. We empower students to build their own mental health toolkit to support themselves and their peers. We challenge the higher education sector, health sector and government to make student mental health a priority. We're improving university communities so that every student gets the mental health support they need to reach their goals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 2011: Standard registration
  • 06 November 2014: Funds received from 1148278 MENTAL WEALTH FOUNDATION LTD.
  • 08 October 2020: Funds received from 1126386 DSA-QAG
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • STUDENT RUN SELF HELP (Working name)
  • SRSH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Susan Rigby Chair 18 September 2019
THE QUALITY ASSURANCE AGENCY FOR HIGHER EDUCATION
Received: On time
Victoria Hurwood Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Anna Pring Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Jenith Auxian Minto Jothi Felix Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Shivali Raichura Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Camille Laurence Putheany Bou Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Oliver Luke Rhys Thomas Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Aneeska Sohal Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Amelia Ireland Trustee 16 November 2020
CHARITYWORKS
Received: On time
Jacqueline Booth Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
Victoria Hill Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £592.38k £2.99m £1.85m £1.11m £1.39m
Total expenditure £533.05k £2.32m £1.99m £1.17m £1.46m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.80k £2.27m £1.17m £337.05k £481.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £529.82k £2.74m £1.51m £654.87k £753.97k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £62.45k £248.93k £346.31k £451.64k £626.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £113 £48 £176 £3.85k £10.94k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £506.52k £2.31m £1.93m £1.08m £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.52k £17.77k £69.09k £87.23k £126.53k
Expenditure - Governance £3.37k £20.15k £12.77k £15.02k £11.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £496.84k £1.47m £1.22m £1.15m £987.90k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £184.04k £493.70k £381.37k £379.37k £284.33k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 07 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 22 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 22 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Office 1.05
Leeds University Union
Lifton Place
Leeds
LS2 9JZ
Phone:
07943 657039