Accounts and annual returns AL-MURAD TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1146493
Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 April 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 11 April 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 24 March 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required