I4U

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of food and medicines among needy people Promotion of Education Provision of Clothes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 16 February 2012: Standard registration
- I4U (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUMERA ZAREEN WAHEED | Chair | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Bokari | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL WAHEED | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £100 | £0 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £100 | £0 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/02/2012
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PAKISTAN, AS ARE DETERMINED UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Junction Road
South Croydon
CR2 6RA
- Phone:
- 02086800008
- Email:
- info@i4u.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window