MONTGOMERYSHIRE FIELD SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To observe, record & preserve the flora & fauna by way of field visits throughout the summer and issue an annual report containing the findings. We also carry out a winter programme of talks in order to promote our activities and raise awareness in the community of items of interest or areas of concern regarding the state of the natural history locally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 October 1972: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Janet Probert | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Beaton | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judith Abbey | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Hughes | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hughes | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Therese Jane Smout | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Beare | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Anne Victoria Young | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Backhouse | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Southam | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Kathryn Thorne | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lorraine Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £1.60k | £1.56k | £1.64k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £962 | £1.12k | £1.19k | £2.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 26 OCTOBER 1946 AS AMENDED 9 DECEMBER 1951, AMENDED BY SCHEME 17 NOVEMBER 2000 as amended on 14 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE INTELLIGENT OBSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND RECORDING OF THE FAUNA AND FLORA OF MONTGOMERYSHIRE. TO FURTHER PUBLIC AWARENESS OF MONTGOMERYSHIRE'S WEALTH OF WILDLIFE BY PROMOTING RESEARCH AND STUDY, HOLDING MEETINGS AND ORGANISING LECTURES AND FIELD EXCURSIONS. TO ENDEAVOUR TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION OF AREAS OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, PARTICULARLY BY CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY BODIES.
Area of benefit
MONTGOMERYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avryn
Sarn
NEWTOWN
SY16 4EJ
- Phone:
- 01686 671112
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window