CHESTER DIOCESAN GUILD OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training in the art of church bell ringing. Training in church bell maintenance. Arranging and running practice meetings for church bell ringers. Arranging and running church bell ringing competitions. Arranging church bell ringing for special events and commemorations. Providing grants towards the preservation, restoration, and augmentation of church bells and their fittings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Halton
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 06 August 2012: Standard registration
- CHESTER DG (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOCELYN ANNE SQUIRES | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|||||
PAMELA THOMSON | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Gillian Sandra Caulfield-Pleavin | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||
David Thomas Glynne Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.31k | £7.18k | £8.91k | £11.35k | £16.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.20k | £2.79k | £8.11k | £2.46k | £17.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) PROMOTING AND FOSTERING THE RINGING OF BELLS FOR CHRISTIAN PRAYER, WORSHIP AND CELEBRATION; B) PROMOTING AND FOSTERING THE RINGING OF BELLS ON OCCASIONS OF NATIONAL OR LOCAL COMMEMORATION, CELEBRATION OR MOURNING; AND C) THE PROVISION, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND AUGMENTATION OF BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS, INCLUDING ANY WHICH ARE REDUNDANT. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL ASPECTS OF BELL RINGING AND MAINTENANCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BARLEY CASTLE CLOSE
APPLETON THORN
WARRINGTON
WA4 4SA
- Phone:
- 01625523962
- Email:
- bob-pollyk@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window