MRS D G LOWE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Human and animal charities within the locality of Congleton Cheshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 13 September 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN KEITH CARTER | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL KINDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29k | £4.36k | £4.23k | £5.30k | £5.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.31k | £4.83k | £4.10k | £4.76k | £5.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DATED 1ST JUNE 1972
Charitable objects
25% OF THE INCOME TO SUCH CHARITES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES CONCERNED WITH THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS 75% OF THE INCOME TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ATRE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES CONCERNED WITH THE RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 WOBURN DRIVE
CONGLETON
CW12 3SS
- Phone:
- 01260291232
- Email:
- johnmkinder@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window