SKILL QUEST TRUST LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Total income:
£955,773
Donations and legacies | £63.84k | |
Charitable activities | £732.30k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5 | |
Other | £159.63k |
Total expenditure:
£971,637
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £929.00k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £42.64k | |
Charitable expenditure | £929.00k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 October 2011: Standard registration
- 26 June 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOLENT EBP (Working name)
- SOLENT SKILL QUEST LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £811.84k | £955.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £815.70k | £971.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £51.87k | £63.84k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £759.98k | £732.30k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £5 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £159.63k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £807.55k | £929.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.15k | £42.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £21.63k | £23.64k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £178.21k | £245.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £197.49k | £282.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 14 July 2014 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 14 July 2014 | 14 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/10/2011 INCORPORATED 06/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/02/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1) COLLABORATING WITH LOCAL BUSINESSES AND BUSINESS ORGANISATIONS IN ENGLAND AND WALES; 2) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING PROGRAMMES AND COURSES , WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES, INSTRUCTIONS AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS; 3) THE PROVISION OF A FRAMEWORK FOR BRINGING TOGETHER LOCAL BUSINESS AND EDUCATION INITIATIVES; 4) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF BETTER COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS ENGAGED IN EDUCATION AND THOSE ENGAGED IN BUSINESS; 5) IN PARTNERSHIP WITH SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF MEANS WHEREBY THOSE ENGAGED IN BUSINESS CAN BE ASSISTED IN IDENTIFYING AND COMMUNICATING MORE CLEARLY THEIR NEEDS IN THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS; 6) IN PARTNERSHIP WITH SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF MEANS FOR THE INCREASE OF THE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THOSE ENGAGED IN BUSINESS AND OF THE WORK OF EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS; 7) ENTERING INTO AGREEMENTS WITH AND ACTING AS AGENTS FOR THE ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN TRAINING, EDUCATION OR EDUCATION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIPS, WORK EXPERIENCE, CAREERS EDUCATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE, BUSINESS MENTORING, VISITS TO EMPLOYER PREMISES, WORK RELATED LEARNING, ENTERPRISE ACTIVITIES AND EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window