MALMESBURY CARNIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Malmesbury Carnival Committee organises a programme of music, sports cultural and children's events, mostly during August and ending in a traditional carnival procession, to raise funds for local good causes in the Malmesbury area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DAVID OVERTON | Chair | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gregory James | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Bruce Foss | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Harris | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen D'Arcy | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CLIVE HARDING | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINZI REBECCA RENSHAW | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.13k | £32.40k | £44.53k | £36.62k | £42.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £27.13k | £45.87k | £40.15k | £38.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/08/2011 as amended on 03 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF MALMESBURY AND SURROUNDING AREA BY FUNDS RAISED FROM CARNIVAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Burnivale
MALMESBURY
SN16 0BL
- Phone:
- 07920023080
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window