THE FOUNTAIN (BEDFORD)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Over the accounting period we are continuing to move into Town Centre chaplaincy as a way of helping others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
Governance
- 06 July 2011: Standard registration
- 25 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FOUNTAIN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £382 | £391 | £386 | £654 | £24 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £1.36k | £538 | £459 | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 22 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 17 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEDFORD BY: (A)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; ( D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION THROUGH CARRYING OUT OUTREACH WORK AND (E) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BEDFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window