COMMUNITY CARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
our charities activities include raising funding to run youth clubs in the surrounding areas of Ely. We assist them in raising funds to ensure sustainability
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CARTS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.39k | £86.04k | £70.87k | £19.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.21k | £84.09k | £70.46k | £18.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 18 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 07 September 2018 | 950 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 18 January 2017 | 353 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: 1) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY UP TO THE AGE OF 17 (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY) LIVING IN THE FENLAND BORDER VILLAGES OF EAST CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF : * ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; * ADVANCING EDUCATION; * RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; * PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY UP TO AGE OF 17 AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window