Financial history THE BLACK-E

Charity Number: 501859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £228.32k £308.30k £281.06k £339.28k £638.29k
Total expenditure £242.15k £292.50k £340.74k £327.79k £621.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.40k £48.83k £49.00k £62.61k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.22k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.90k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £621.36k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0