Trustees THE BLACK-E
Charity Number: 501859

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miguel Doforo | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
ANDREA VAZ | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAHMA KINGFISHER | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANINE ROSS | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG ROGERS | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JENNINGS | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemima Khalli | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAN GREEN | Trustee | 03 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Patricia Harpe | Trustee | 05 May 1968 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.