Financial history Ebenezer Baptist Church (Mold)

Charity number: 1144374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £256.58k £251.77k £219.69k £233.46k £222.74k
Total expenditure £213.34k £347.77k £283.41k £237.41k £217.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A