DESIGN MIDLANDS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes for the public benefit, best regeneration practices mainly throughout the UK Midlands, by: enabling high standards of design and architecture in the built and living environment; delivering education and training to all involved in such creative activities; supporting other charitable projects and initiatives for community benefit in the operating area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 September 2011: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Funds received from 1108699 URBAN VISION NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE
- DESIGN MIDLANDS (Working name)
- OPUN (Working name)
- ARCHITECTURE EAST MIDLANDS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver James William Spicer | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Stephen Martin Stoney | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Lathbury | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shauna Mary Bradley | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Reeve | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Ann Richards | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Watson | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY GLENDON HUNT | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JO FAIRFAX | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.51k | £137.15k | £169.82k | £170.31k | £220.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.83k | £142.83k | £162.14k | £176.65k | £217.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.68k | £6.00k | £36.00k | £83.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2023 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2023 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/05/2011 as amended on 31 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF BEST PRACTICE IN THE FIELD OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN EAST MIDLANDS ("THE OPERATING AREA"), AND INCLUDING (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THAT GENERALITY) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF HIGH STANDARDS OF DESIGN AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT WITHIN THE OPERATING AREA. (2) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY AMONG THOSE INVOLVED IN THE DESIGN, DELIVERY, ENGAGEMENT OR FUNDING OF REGENERATION ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE OPERATING AREA. (3) THE PROMOTION, OPERATION AND/OR SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITABLE PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, AND PARTICULARLY THOSE LIVING WITHIN THE OPERATING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Annex
Pera Business Park
Nottingham Road
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE13 0PB
- Phone:
- 07941492542
- Email:
- angus@designmidlands.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window