Financial history BOURNES GREEN JUNIOR SCHOOL PRIVATE SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1143386
Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £75.96k £82.50k £85.94k £45.53k £54.21k
Total expenditure £55.64k £58.71k £67.15k £32.90k £44.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A