BOURNES GREEN JUNIOR SCHOOL PRIVATE SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational charity to support the extra-curricular and curriculum support activities of children attending Bournes Green Junior School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

1 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 16 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Edwin Lupton | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.96k | £82.50k | £85.94k | £45.53k | £54.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.64k | £58.71k | £67.15k | £32.90k | £44.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 05/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF BOURNES GREEN JUNIOR SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 DUNGANNON DRIVE
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS1 3NH
- Phone:
- 01702587913
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window