Accounts and annual returns THE WOLLATON HISTORICAL AND CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 501862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 August 2024 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required