Financial history THE WOLLATON HISTORICAL AND CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 501862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.74k £5.87k £14.92k £11.41k £9.40k
Total expenditure £2.06k £2.13k £9.85k £22.81k £5.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A