FRIENDS OF FAREHAM COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Volunteers, To enhance the waiting area, To publicise the Hospital's services, To encourage local organisations and businesses to support the Hospital where appropriate, To bring to the attention of the Hospital staff any concerns, To provide funding for equipment for the use of patients and staff, which could not be provided through the NHS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
- FFCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lois Anne Hannah-Ford | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Ford Mr | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Marie Bayford | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Kirsteen Cope | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Petta Ann Dillaway | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Kirby | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Peter Humphreys | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA MARGARET GULLIFORD | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE PALMER | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88k | £3.51k | £3.81k | £7.68k | £8.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £2.45k | £6.17k | £9.96k | £7.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2011
Charitable objects
1)TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF FAREHAM COMMUNITY BY A) SUPPORTING THE HOSPITAL AND ITS STAFF WITH HANDS AND FEET EFFORT AND BY GIFTING MATERIAL AND MINOR EQUIPMENT. B) PROVIDING ENHANCEMENT TO THE RECEPTION AREA, CORRIDORS AND WAITING ROOMS; AND C) PROVIDING A WELCOMING AND GUIDANCE STEWARDING SERVICE. 2) TO FOSTER THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF FAREHAM COMMUNITY OUTPATIENTS IN BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Sovereign Crescent
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO14 4LT
- Phone:
- 07904445770
- Email:
- sckirby@dowlans.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window