CANTERBURY RUGBY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Canterbury Rugby Charity promotes participation and interest in the sport of Rugby Football in and around the Canterbury area inorder to improve health, fitness, teamwork and leadership within the local population without descrimination. This is delivered through raising awareness and supporting those involved in making Rugby Football accessable to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 20 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles David Hilton | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|||||
COLIN STEVEN SCURR | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Giles Hilton | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.11k | £36.59k | £47.94k | £21.05k | £16.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.10k | £28.23k | £44.01k | £24.60k | £25.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 24 September 2020 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 24 September 2020 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2011
Charitable objects
4.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 4.2 OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Club House
Merton Lane North
Nackington Road
Canterbury
Kent
CT4 7BA
- Phone:
- 07831154865
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window