JAI MAA BHAMESHWARI KALI MANDIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Hindu religion. Relief of poverty. Advancement of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 21 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUBHASH BANSAL | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
USHA PARMAR | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
KULDIP BANSAL | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BHARAT BUSHAN | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.85k | £90.41k | £78.48k | £71.43k | £94.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.96k | £83.04k | £88.71k | £74.07k | £96.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.56k | £8.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/03/2011
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION RELIEF OF POVERTY ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
136 Burnley Road
Hapton
Burnley
BB11 5QT
- Phone:
- 07973161970
- Email:
- KULDIPPROIMAGE@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window