LOZELLS METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
undertake activities which are in keeping with us being a church in the community for the community. These include Christian worship and study, children's and youth activities, facilities of members of the community - internet access, soup kitchen, dance, adult classes, art project, Job Club, Benefits Advice, ESOL classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 22 December 2011: Standard registration
- LMC (Working name)
- LMCC (Previous name)
- LOZELLS METHODIST COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alison Richards | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Salome Noah | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE NANATCHOUNGA | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD NOAH | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYN BLAKE | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eddy Aigbe | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|||||
EVAN ANDERSON JONES | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL DORSETT | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ERNESTINA BROOKES | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BROOKES | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE PARKES | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELNORA BARZEY | Trustee | 16 February 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.49k | £110.58k | £99.17k | £132.96k | £100.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.61k | £115.78k | £87.45k | £115.75k | £122.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 August 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 August 2020 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 20/09/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lozells Methodist Church
163 Gerrard Street
Lozells
Birmingham
B19 2AH
- Phone:
- 01215549360
- Email:
- info@lozellsmc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window