Financial history NORTH WEST VEHICLE RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1143261
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £45.01k £58.38k £43.51k £69.95k £62.71k
Total expenditure £42.14k £33.60k £53.27k £50.52k £52.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A