Accounts and annual returns EMMAUS BRADFORD

Charity number: 1142210
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 October 2024 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 October 2024 182 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window