SPORTS DREAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to enable sporting activity in the village
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 June 2011: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Funds received from 1137078 SPORTS DREAM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDY HORNER | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ISTED | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEE | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID SHIPPERLEY MIP DIP | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MS DEBBIE HEATH MAAT | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.01k | £35 | £420 | £97 | £706 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £1.81k | £963 | £2.50k | £455 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/11/2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SELSEY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Selsey Business Centre
The Bridleway
SELSEY
Chichester
UNITED KINGDOM
PO20 0AA
- Phone:
- 01243603070
- Email:
- Treasurer@sportsdream.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window