Financial history SPORTING KHALSA COMMUNITY FACILITIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1142196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £143.41k £91.46k £123.40k £79.97k £355.91k
Total expenditure £107.37k £90.62k £93.35k £80.11k £119.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A