SPORTING KHALSA COMMUNITY FACILITIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1142196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sporting Khalsa Community Facilities aim is to inspire future generations to build better communities for all. Providing sports facilities to use sport to educate, motivate and inspire youngsters and adults.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £355,910
Total expenditure: £119,522

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Walsall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TARLAZ DOSNAJH Trustee 02 June 2011
None on record
BALBIR SINGH Trustee 04 May 2011
None on record
Manjit Singh Gill Trustee 04 May 2011
THE SOHAN AND SURINDER SINGH GILL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £143.41k £91.46k £123.40k £79.97k £355.91k
Total expenditure £107.37k £90.62k £93.35k £80.11k £119.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 April 2024 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 April 2024 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 March 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 September 2022 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 September 2022 226 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLOBE HOUSE
3 BRADFORD PLACE
WALSALL
WEST MIDLNDS
WS11PL
Phone:
01902 475105