Accounts and annual returns MADRASATUL BANAT AL-ISLAMIAH

Charity number: 1142561
Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Annual return 25 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Annual return 25 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Annual return 25 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
Annual return 25 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days