Accounts and annual returns THORNHILL NURSERY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1141848
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 10 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 10 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 03 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 July 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 05 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 05 July 2013 On Time