SHABANG INCLUSIVE LEARNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity:- - to create a supportive community which caters for the needs of families with a child with additional needs - to deliver high quality arts events, workshops and training sessions - to support, promote and provide training, volunteering and placement opportunities in the arts - to provide a sustainable working environment for participatory arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £102,910 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
Governance
- 28 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA DRENNAN | Chair | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Lily Lockwood | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farida Flaye | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Whittaker | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.78k | £333.98k | £122.27k | £226.27k | £236.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.79k | £74.56k | £96.00k | £120.97k | £175.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.90k | £166.65k | £16.31k | £122.30k | £102.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR AMONG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Providence Chapel
Hollins Row
Slaithwaite
Huddersfield
West Yorkshire
HD7 5LA
- Phone:
- 01484 505260
- Email:
- info@shabang.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window