Financial history NEW LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1142105
Charity reporting is up to date (165 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.27m £2.54m £1.88m £2.11m £1.19m
Total expenditure £2.35m £2.50m £2.16m £2.10m £1.18m
Income from government contracts £2.15m £2.37m £1.37m £1.31m £902.04k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £17.36k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.15m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £2.37m £1.82m £2.09m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £124.14k £170.01k £56.45k £23.88k £15.71k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.38m £2.16m £2.10m £1.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.06m £1.12m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.02k £0 £0 £10.54k £10.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £821 £0 £0