Financial history HOUSE OF PRAYER FOR ALL NATIONS INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1142114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.57k £3.25k £4.45k £4.44k £5.00k
Total expenditure £3.85k £3.14k £4.40k £4.12k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A