MALDON AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer free, independent, confidential and impartial advice to everyone in our catchment area on their rights and responsibilities. We aim to provide the advice people need for the problems they face and improve the policies and practices that affect their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £79,500 from 1 government contract(s) and £27,325 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
- 30 January 2012: Funds received from 293372 MALDON AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Morin | Chair | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Weaver | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Townshend | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roberts | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Melanie Halls | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Cox | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Brown | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Wakeling | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dollery | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.89k | £260.87k | £267.50k | £267.50k | £268.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.04k | £229.41k | £270.64k | £270.64k | £273.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £70.27k | £83.10k | £70.74k | £0 | £79.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £89.21k | £78.93k | £116.93k | £108.42k | £27.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEP 2021 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEP 2021 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN MALDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MALDON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
COUNCIL OFFICES
PRINCES ROAD
MALDON
ESSEX
CM9 5DL
- Phone:
- 01621857774
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window