IRELAND COLLIERY CHESTERFIELD BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is the provision of musical instruction in the playing of brass instrumentation. The band members also enter local and national brass band competitions, and perform at concerts and other charity events throughout the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 May 1975: Standard registration
- IRELAND COLLIERY (CHESTERFIELD) BAND (Working name)
- CHESTERFIELD AND DISTRICT BAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simone Smith | Chair | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Oldale | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Damian John Botham | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Joe Roberts BEM | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Paul Truscott | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Jean Spencer | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Whyatt | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.58k | £4.01k | £7.82k | £10.43k | £10.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.83k | £6.70k | £6.66k | £6.82k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1973 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 1985, 6 JUNE 1991, 29 JUNE 2004 AND 18 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF MUSIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO MUSIC PRESENTED BY BRASS BANDS BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO WHICH MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC SHALL HAVE ACCESS. B) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE PERSONS WISHING TO LEARN TO PLAY A BRASS BAND INSTRUMENT.
Area of benefit
CHESTERFIELD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Silver Well Drive
Staveley
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S43 3LR
- Phone:
- 01142746561
- Email:
- iccbbtreasurer@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window