TRINITY PRE-SCHOOL FAREHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by offering appropriate play, education and care facilities and to ensure that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income includes £84,819 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 07 July 2011: Standard registration
- 29 May 2012: Funds received from 1062842 TRINITY PRE-SCHOOL FAREHAM
- 15 March 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.23k | £102.97k | £97.86k | £118.93k | £94.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.97k | £96.47k | £94.24k | £95.27k | £99.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.80k | £91.31k | £84.49k | £109.41k | £84.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 35 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/06/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES. 2) TO ENSURE THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window